Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gwathney, Natasha, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Baltierra, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner's Request for Order for Change in Child Support, Visitation & Payment of Uncovered Health Care Costs Filed 7/5/2022 - Order Shortening Time Granted - For receipt of mediation recommendation, Continued from 10/12/2022 per Petitioner's Request Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner's Request for Order for Change in Child Support, Visitation & Payment of Uncovered Health Care Costs Filed 7/5/2022 - Order Shortening Time Granted - For receipt of mediation recommendation Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reschedule Hearing | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Mediation Cancellation Report |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Mediation Cancellation Report |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Cancellation | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Referral to Family Court Services Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.