Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rambach, Dawn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rambach, Arron, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Request for Order - DV/TRO Filed 12/01/2020 Temporary Orders Granted; Continued from 2/16/2021 on Petitioner's objection to Mediation Recommendation Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration Amended Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing - Modification Respondent's RFO for Change of Child Support - Filed 02/16/2021 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) RFO for Change of Child Support |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Recommendation and Order Temporary Mediation Recommendation and Order Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 12/1/2020- Temporary Orders Granted; Continued from 12/22/20 for Receipt of Mediation Report Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.