Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sauter, Courtney, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Monday, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Christopher R. Chandler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitiner filed 2/1/21 RFO re Custody, Visitation and Modification of Restraining Order Judge: Chandler, Christopher R |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner filed 2/1/21 RFO re Custody, Visitation and Modification of Restraining Order Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170) | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing as to Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.