Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Shaver, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShaver, Donald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryDcss Family Support - Jbsis 3.0 |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motion Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Department Child Support Services Support Calculations | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment-DCSS
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS Complaint and Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.