Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Galvan, Tanya Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Borrelli, Donald Steven, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts Superior with SANCHEZ, MAURICE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
RFO - CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 11/17/2020
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 11/17/2020
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST - PARTY 12/07/2020
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00WITNESS LIST 12/07/2020
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00SUMMONS 11/17/2020
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 11/17/2020
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/17/2020 I&E
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00WAGE ASSIGN ORDER - SPOUSAL / PARTNER SUPPORT 11/22/2021
Date: November 22, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/21/2020
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/07/2021 NOW (JAG Out)
Date: December 07, 2021DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/04/2021
Date: August 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE 11/24/2021
Date: November 24, 2021DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/04/2021
Date: August 04, 2021RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 10/25/2021
Date: October 25, 2021EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 10/04/2021
Date: October 04, 2021RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 09/02/2021
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/04/2021
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 08/10/2021 POS Electronic re Filed JUT Packet
Date: August 10, 2021MINUTE ORDER 02/08/2021
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/04/2021
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/22/2021 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00POINTS & AUTHORITIES 12/07/2020
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 02/01/2021
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/22/2021
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 08/04/2021
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.