Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Allen Randy Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Jeffrey W. Korn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
June 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 41 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 DSU - MTN (Modification Hearing) Judge: Jeffrey W. Korn |
|
June 03, 2022 | Order | ||
June 03, 2022 | Minute Order | ||
April 20, 2022 | Proof of Service | ||
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 11, 2022 | DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) - -Child Support (Modified to Zero) | ||
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) (-Child Support (Modified to Zero) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 19, 2021 | Notice - Entry of Judgment | ||
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.