Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Athena Palombi, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Erik Stephen Velie, against Jennifer Lin, Yang Lin, represented by Christopher David Denny, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 01, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: November 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 10, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 09, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 07, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 05, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV373782 Athena Palombi vs Yang Lin Plaintiff’s Motion for order and publication of summons is DENIED WITHOUT et al PREJUDICE. While the attachments to the motion include extensive correspondence wi... | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint, Atty Denny |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons Complaint |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: Association/Co-Counsel Association of Attorney Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.