Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David Biggs, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by James Michael Treglio, against Lyft, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a representative action brought by David Biggs on behalf of the State of California and aggrieved employees against Lyft, Inc. The complaint alleges multiple violations of California labor laws. The violations include willful miscla...
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 04, 2020Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: June 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
9 COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA 12 DAVID BIGGS, an individual, on behalf of the State of California, as a private attorney general, 13 and on behalf of all aggrieved employees, TENTATIVE RULING RE: PETITION T...
Judge: Patricia Lucas |
|
September 25, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Patricia M. Lucas |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Related Cases Notice of Related Case |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of undocumented action, $1,000 complex fee taken |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Deeming Case Complex Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 9/25/20 at 10am in D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes Judge: Patricia M. Lucas |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.