Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fuzu Li, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Jingming Cai, Sac Attorneys Llp, represented by Seth W. Wiener, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2020 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence Unlimited (25) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 06, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: February 06, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 13, 2020Request
Date: July 21, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: February 06, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: September 08, 2020Motion: Compel Arbitration
Date: July 06, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
August 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration
Judge: Socrates P. Manoukian |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply to Hearing: Petition to Compel Arbitration |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Memo in Opposition |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.