Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Svensson, Jonas, filed a(n) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) case against Io73 Investments Inc, Strauss, Tristan, represented by Selna, Steven M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
This complaint is a verified petition for a writ of mandamus filed by Jonas Svensson against i073 Investments, Inc. and Tristan Strauss. Svensson alleges that he is entitled to inspect and copy the books and records of The Headwaters Group, of which ...
Demurrer
Date: April 06, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Petition for Writ of Mandate, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Demurrer
Date: April 26, 2021Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Ruling, Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Writ of Mandate
Date: June 21, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Order, Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Hearing
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Appeal, Filed
Date: October 14, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Ruling, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: September 08, 20212022_02_22_iO73_Investment_s_Opening_Brief
Date: February 22, 20222022_05_11_iO73_Oppositi_n_for_Attorneys_Fees
Date: May 11, 2022Reply to Mx for Fees
Date: May 17, 2022dec of SLR ISO REPLY to Mx for Fees
Date: May 17, 2022Motion: Attorney Fees
Date: December 06, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Appeal, Filed
Date: October 14, 20212022_05_31_iO73_CMC_statement_
Date: May 31, 2022CMC Statement - HD 6-20-22
Date: June 08, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Motion: Attorney Fees
Date: May 23, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 31, 2022ack and satis
Date: December 13, 2023Opposition, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Reply Brief, Filed
Date: March 24, 20212022_08_03_CMC_Writ_of_Mandate
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 20, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Motion: Attorney Fees
Date: August 08, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 08, 2022dec of slr
Date: December 06, 2022case 285 MFF
Date: December 06, 2022CASE 285 - proposed judgment
Date: December 12, 2022revised jmt w date
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 04, 20232023_01_04_iO73_Notice_of_Remote_Appearance
Date: January 05, 20232023_01_24_iO73_Oppositi_rneys_Fees_on_Appeal
Date: January 24, 2023REPLY iso MFF
Date: January 31, 20232023_02_02_iO73_NTO_Remote_Appearance
Date: February 02, 2023prop judgment
Date: February 10, 2023CASE 285 - AMEND JMT
Date: March 03, 2023CASE 285 - Notice of Entry
Date: March 09, 2023Opposition, Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance, Filed
Date: January 04, 2023Opinion, Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Association of Attorney/Counsel, Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance, Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Hearing on Return on Remittitur, Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance, Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Notification of Est Cost of Preparing Clerk's Transcript
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Filing Remittitur, Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Judgment, Filed
Date: January 04, 2023Reply, Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Related Case, Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Hearing
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Hearing
Date: January 09, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Remittitur, Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Judgment, Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ack and satis | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE 285 - Notice of Entry | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE 285 - Notice of Entry Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed re Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE 285 - AMEND JMT | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE 285 - AMEND JMT Judgment, Filed - Amended Judgment |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | prop judgment | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
prop order Order, Filed GRANTING MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 06, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Attorney Fees; Hearing: Return on Remittiur
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Hearing : Return on Remittitur Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.