Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Dekkert, Candace, Latala Homes, Inc., Latala, Paul, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hannon, John, Ii, Pro Se, against Latala Homes, Inc., Latala, Paul, Phan, Tuan Anh, Pietryga, Dominika, represented by Boardman, Nora Rufail, Boyd, Jesse Abraham, Hogan, Christopher John, Reyes, Von, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
OC168685 CROSS DEF CMS
Date: March 12, 2024p CMC Stmt FINAL 2024 03 11
Date: March 11, 2024p Cross-Complaint MOE 2nd Amd
Date: February 23, 20242nd Amended Summons on X-Complaint
Date: February 23, 2024d Ntc of Further CMC 2024 02 02
Date: February 02, 2024OC161997- CMS
Date: January 16, 2024p cm110 - CMC Stmt 2024 01 11
Date: January 11, 202456131CROSS010dd8
Date: April 13, 202256131Summo0050f6
Date: April 13, 202256686CaseM0092fe
Date: April 25, 202257232PROOF006631
Date: May 05, 2022NTC of change of firm name
Date: January 09, 2024C. Dekkert- Notice of Change of Address
Date: August 17, 2022IMG_0004
Date: August 25, 20229.16.22 dek fac_0001
Date: September 16, 20229.16.22 dek_0001
Date: September 16, 20229.16.22 dek sum_0001
Date: September 16, 202263698CaseM007145
Date: September 20, 202265077ANSWE00c390
Date: October 18, 202211.14.22 Dekkert summons_000031
Date: November 14, 202266664NOTIC00f578
Date: November 19, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY
Date: December 08, 202212.21.22 dekkert.pos.ahn
Date: December 22, 202212.21.22 Dekkert.pos.pietygra
Date: December 22, 202268683Notic014122
Date: January 04, 202368683CaseM0027ab
Date: January 04, 20231.17.23 cmc
Date: January 17, 2023p CMC Stmt 01.17.23 - Dekkert
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel 01.20.23
Date: January 20, 2023Sub of Attorney-signed 2023 03 03 signed
Date: March 03, 2023p CMC Stmt 2023 05 12
Date: May 12, 2023OC133927 CMS
Date: May 17, 2023cmc-110.5.22.23
Date: May 22, 2023CaseManagementStatementDekkert
Date: September 12, 2023p cm110 - CMC Stmt 2023 09 13 -FINAL
Date: September 13, 2023p POS of Summons as to Tuan Anh Phan
Date: September 13, 2023order.mo.relief.10.27.23
Date: October 27, 2023mo.relief.10.27.23
Date: October 27, 2023dec.mo.relief.10.27.23
Date: October 27, 2023sub.atty.10.31.23
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | OC168685 CROSS DEF CMS | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Latala, Paul; Cross Complainant, Defendant LATALA HOMES, INC. |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | p CMC Stmt FINAL 2024 03 11 | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Amendment to Cross-Complaint | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | p Cross-Complaint MOE 2nd Amd | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 2nd Amended Summons on X-Complaint | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Latala, Paul; Cross Complainant, Defendant LATALA HOMES, INC. |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | d Ntc of Further CMC 2024 02 02 | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.