Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tyson , Tye, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano, Mark, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Shugart, Jonathan Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Notice |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
40916CaseMana00d6d60 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
4119267_737TysonAnsw Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tyson.Complaint docs Complaint Filed |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tyson.Summons Summons Issued / Filed |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tyson.Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.