Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Foshay, Amber Lynn, Foshay, Linda, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Drake, Kristen Elizabeth, Pearce, Amber Danette, against Alliance Communities Inc, Cypress Point Re Investors Llc, Greystar Worldwide Llc, Leblanco, Mckenzie Jean, Younger, Tyreece, (total of 5) See All represented by Moriarty, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
Category(33) Unlimited Wrongful Eviction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
2022-01-27 - Revised Request for Entry of Default (Younger) - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: January 28, 20222021-01-03 - POS of Summons Tyreece Younger- Foshay v. Cypress Point Re Investors et al.
Date: January 28, 2022CMC STMT (3-1-22).docx
Date: March 02, 20222022-03-08 - [S] Pls.' Case Mgmt Statement - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: March 08, 2022terri-6487cmcstmt42922
Date: April 29, 20222022-05-09 - S Pls.' Case Mgmt Statement - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: May 10, 2022terri-6487cmvstmt71522
Date: July 15, 20222022-10-17 - POS Pls.' Case Mgmt Statement - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: October 17, 20222022-10-17 - Pls.' Case Mgmt Statement - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: October 17, 2022terri-6487cmcstmt102622
Date: October 26, 2022terri-6487cmcstmt1323
Date: January 04, 20232023-01-09 - Pls CMC - Foshay v Cypress Point
Date: January 10, 20232023-01-09 - POS CMS - Foshay v. Cypress
Date: January 10, 20232023-01-17 - POS - Foshay v. Cypress
Date: January 17, 20232023-01-17 - S Notice - Foshay v Cypress
Date: January 17, 2023EVIDENCE INDEX MSJ (3.8.23)
Date: March 08, 2023MPA for MSJ (3.8.23)
Date: March 08, 2023notice of motion msj (3.8.23)
Date: March 08, 2023AE DECLARATION (3.8.23)
Date: March 08, 2023separate statement msj (3.8.23)
Date: March 08, 20232023-05-03 - POS - Foshay v. Cypress
Date: May 03, 20232023-05-03 - Decl - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: May 03, 20232023-05-03 - Pls Opp - Foshay v Cypress Point
Date: May 03, 20232023-05-10 - Dec MTC - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: May 10, 20232023-05-10 - POS - Foshay v. Cypress
Date: May 10, 20232023-05-10 - MTC - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: May 10, 2023Defs Amended Notice of Mtn for MSJ-5-12-23
Date: May 12, 2023Foshay SC filing MPAx
Date: June 15, 20232023-08-08 - Pls' Opp'n to MSJ - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: August 08, 20232023-08-08 - POS Pls' Opp'n to MSJ - Foshay v. Cypress Point
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023-08-08 - Pls' Opp'n to MSJ - Foshay v. Cypress Point | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023-08-08 - POS Pls' Opp'n to MSJ - Foshay v. Cypress Point | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filing Party: Plaintiff Foshay, Amber Lynn; Plaintiff Foshay, Linda |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Party: Plaintiff Foshay, Amber Lynn; Plaintiff Foshay, Linda |
|
June 29, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV02600 FOSHAY et al. v. CYPRESS POINT RE INVESTORS LLC et al. PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND SANCTIONS Plaintiffs Amber Lynn Foshay and Linda Foshay seek responses to the foll... | |
June 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV02600 FOSHAY et al. v. CYPRESS POINT RE INVESTORS LLC et al. PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND SANCTIONS Plaintiffs Amber Lynn Foshay and Linda Foshay seek responses to the foll... | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Foshay SC filing MPAx | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Party: Defendant Cypress Point Re Investors LLC; Defendant Greystar Worldwide LLC |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Defs Amended Notice of Mtn for MSJ-5-12-23 | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Party: Defendant Cypress Point Re Investors LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.