Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brar, Ranjeet K, against Mendoza, Emilio, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration/Affidavit Proof of Non-Service |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.