Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barker, Ashley Renee, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
Category(43) Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Petition for Decree of Change Of Name
Date: December 18, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: February 10, 2021Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement
Date: December 21, 2020OSC re Name Change
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted. If proof of publication has not been submitted and there is no appearance by the Petitioner, the mat...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted. If proof of publication has not been submitted and there is no appearance by the Petitioner, the matter will be denied without prejudice. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Petition Hearing Petition for Change of Name;Continued from 2/10/21, 2/24/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Hearing Returned Mail Notice of Hearing; Remailed to 70 Fairgate Lane Chico, CA 95926 |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Hearing Returned Mail Notice of Hearing; Remailed to 70 Fairgate Lane Chico, CA 95926 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Petition Hearing Petition for Change of Name; Continued from 2/10/2021 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted. If proof of publication has not been submitted and there is no appearance by the Petitioner, the matter will be denied without prejudice. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.