Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The S P Thomas Company Of Northern California, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wilson, Randall Ray, against Rehklau, John P, Rehklau, Les A, Rehklau, Rebecca J, represented by Fairbrook, John David, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 25, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: January 21, 2021Order
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: December 08, 2020Settlement Conference
Date: May 25, 2022Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 07, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: July 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 09, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 20, 2021Jury Trial
Date: July 11, 2022Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered
Date: September 20, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 25, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 08, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 08, 2020Complaint
Date: December 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Jury Trial Time Estimate 6 Days Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Trial Readiness Conference Time Estimate 6 Days Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Confidential Protective Order Re Confidential Information Settlement Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Proof of Service |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Confidential Protective Order Re Confidential Information Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.