Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnston, Blake, Johnston, Cheryl, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by West, Joseph Anthony, against Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
Category(18) Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Blake Johnston and Cheryl Johnston against defendant Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. The plaintiffs allege two causes of action: breach of contract and breach of the implied covenant of good fa...
Case Management Statement
Date: May 14, 2021Complaint
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: December 02, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 02, 2020Order on Fee Waiver - Granted
Date: December 02, 2020Order on Fee Waiver - Granted
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 15, 2021Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: February 16, 2022Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: March 03, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2022Returned Mail
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2022Notice
Date: February 18, 2022Returned Mail
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2022Declaration
Date: April 01, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 06, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 13, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Santions of $100 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.