Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Corrigan, Michael, Sloan, Tine F, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) case represented by Rydell, John R, Ii, against Sell, Michelle Ann Beltran, represented by Brown, Russell A, Horowitz, Sanford, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Reject Letter
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: March 25, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Reject Letter
Date: June 09, 2020Reject Letter
Date: June 22, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 05, 2021Motion: Vacate
Date: October 16, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Motion: Vacate
Date: October 09, 2020Motion: Vacate
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Reject Letter
Date: October 14, 2020Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 19, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 20, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 04, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Case Management Statement 4-28-22
Date: April 28, 202222.05.13 CMC Statement - cm110
Date: April 29, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 03, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 05, 2021Notice of Cont. CMC 5-13-22
Date: May 13, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Complaint, Filed
Date: March 24, 2020CMC statement.privacy issue 9-7-22
Date: September 07, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: March 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: March 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: March 24, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: April 06, 2020Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: July 27, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Document, Lodged
Date: September 28, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: October 29, 2020Order, Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 07, 2022SOA M Sell
Date: September 09, 2022Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 15, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 11/18/22 |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SOA M Sell | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC statement.privacy issue 9-7-22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.