Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Scharf, Jeffrey, Smith-Scharf, Sherril, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gordon, Paul, against Krawez, Brian, Scharf Investments, Llc, represented by Baldocchi, Jennifer Stivers, Chun, David, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
52999SUPPL00a491
Date: February 04, 202252998SUPPL024f57
Date: February 04, 20222022_02_03_POS_re_reply_re_fee_motion_signed
Date: February 04, 2022SUMMARY
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2022POS
Date: May 20, 202252998REPLY003872
Date: February 04, 202252998SUPPL0183d7
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | POS | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMARY | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
March 14, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV01388 SCHARF v SCHARF INVESTMENTS LLC/BRIAN KRAWEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES as PREVAILING PARTY The motion is denied. The threshold issue for the Court’s determination on this motion is whether ... | |
March 12, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV01388 SCHARF v SCHARF INVESTMENTS LLC/BRIAN KRAWEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES as PREVAILING PARTY The motion is denied. The threshold issue for the Court’s determination on this motion is whether ... | |
March 11, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV01388 SCHARF v SCHARF INVESTMENTS LLC/BRIAN KRAWEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES as PREVAILING PARTY The motion is denied. The threshold issue for the Court’s determination on this motion is whether ... | |
March 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV01388 SCHARF v SCHARF INVESTMENTS LLC/BRIAN KRAWEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES as PREVAILING PARTY The motion is denied. The threshold issue for the Court’s determination on this motion is whether ... | |
March 09, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 20CV01388 SCHARF v SCHARF INVESTMENTS LLC/BRIAN KRAWEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES as PREVAILING PARTY The motion is denied. The threshold issue for the Court’s determination on this motion is whether ... | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.