Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rocky Top Rentals, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Jeffrey Allen, against Miller, Mark L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management112 days |
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Case Management Conference
Date: September 16, 2020Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: October 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 10, 2020Request
Date: October 01, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: September 16, 2020Complaint
Date: May 13, 2020Declaration
Date: June 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Default Judgment by Court Proof of Mailing |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Court Status Conference Status of Default Judgment Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment By Court
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1-10 Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment Request |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
All - Proof of Mailing Proof of Mailing |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Rochelle Zelenka-Diatikar in Support of Entry of Default Judgment Declaration |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment Declaration |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Possession Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.