Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Cornell, Charles W, represented by Sweeney, Joseph George, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management152 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: July 27, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2020Order
Date: August 10, 2020Order Dismissing Action
Date: August 13, 2020Stipulation
Date: August 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 22, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000
Date: July 10, 2020Complaint
Date: March 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
All - Proof of Mailing Proof of Mailing |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Order for Entry of Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment Proof of Mailing |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Entry of Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment Stipulation |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Case Management Conference Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.