Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martinez, Marcella Elizabeth, filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited (08) case represented by Yousefi, Ali R, against California Department Of State Hospitals, Napa State Hospital, Black, Cindy, represented by Alweiss, Daniel Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited (08) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer or Response: Public Entity Answer to complaint for damages |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons Complaint |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed Summons |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.