Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Englanoff, Joseph, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Walsh, Michael J., against Steed, Casey Lynn, represented by Kinsey, John P, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCabe, Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management153 days |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2020 |
Category(23): Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2021Letter
Date: October 26, 2020Order
Date: March 15, 2021Order
Date: August 26, 2021Motion
Date: July 07, 2020Motion
Date: July 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to dismiss appeal - F081620 Order |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Document: Other | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Respondent's Brief | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Judge, Other |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.