Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Haley, Jennifer Allison, against Hicks, David Michael Allen, represented by Pharr, Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Suppress PC 1538.5
Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition or Objections To Def's PC1538.5 Motion To Suppress |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion: Suppress PC1538.5 | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.