Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SAND CANYON OAKS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS DAN EDDINGS
On February 16, 2021 a small claims (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association, against Eddings Teresa, and Eddings Dan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 16, 2021
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2021 | ||
February 23, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2021; Result Type to Held | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association on 12/17/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection - Proof of Service: As To Parties: removed | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff) |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection - Proof of Service: Name Extension changed from Proof of Service to - Proof of Service; As To Parties changed from Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff) to Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection Proof of Service: Name Extension: Proof of Service; As To Parties changed from Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff) to Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff) | |
February 18, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection] | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection - Proof of Service: Status Date changed from 02/19/2021 to 02/18/2021; As To Parties: removed | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 16, 2021 | Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection | ||
February 16, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 16, 2021 | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) | ||
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Dan Eddings (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/05/2021; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Teresa Eddings (Defendant); Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/05/2021 |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection - Proof of Service: Status Date changed from 02/18/2021 to 02/16/2021; As To Parties: removed | |
December 17, 2020 | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court | ||
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Dan Eddings (Defendant) to Dan Eddings (Defendant) | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Dan Eddings (Defendant) clerical correction | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sand Canyon Oaks Property Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Dan Eddings (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|