Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Absolute Bonding Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rubinfeld Harold, against Mendez Marisol, Rocha Jose Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION on
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIG; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINALS; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 14, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 14, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 17, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 11, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5
Date: April 15, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 15, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 15, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
Date: September 20, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 25, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5
Date: October 25, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIG
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: November 03, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINALS
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: EXEMPTION FROM CCP SECTION 1799.91
Date: January 26, 2022Order (name extension) - Order ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS
Date: February 03, 2022Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: February 03, 2022Declaration RE: UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION on 09/14/2020
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Hearing |
Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311 Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension) |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION against Defendant JOSE EDUARDO ROCHA and Defendant MARISOL MENDEZ on the Complaint filed by ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION on for the principal amount of $5,500.09, attorney fees of $420.00, interest of $867.00, and costs of $305.00 for a total of $7,092.09. | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS: Filed By: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: | |
February 03, 2022 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default and Default Judgment scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 03, 2022 | Order (name extension) - Order ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS | ||
February 03, 2022 | Default Judgment - Default Judgment | ||
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: EXEMPTION FROM CCP SECTION 1799.91; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff) | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff) | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration UNDER CCP SECTION 1033.5; Filed by: ABSOLUTE BONDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.