Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sunpower Capital Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Friedman Joshua P, against Li Ruijun, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Karen Moskowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Application for Publication; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Default entered as to Ruijun Li; On the Complaint filed by SunPower Capital, LLC on
Date: January 11, 2021Summary of the Case; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 26, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: May 26, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: May 26, 2020Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: October 13, 2020Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: October 14, 2020Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: November 10, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2021Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case
Date: January 11, 2021Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 11, 2021Complaint; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ruijun Li (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.