Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thomas Vanessa, against Johnson Mary B, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: January 17, 2020Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: July 31, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: February 28, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: September 16, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 27, 2023Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: April 27, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Mary B Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Mary B Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Mary B Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Barclays Bank Delaware (Plaintiff); As to: Mary B Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.