Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert Scott, against Gitlin Kiara C, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kiara C Gitlin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Declaration in support of motion; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 02, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: January 02, 2020Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: May 07, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Date: October 03, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause
Date: January 12, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 13, 2023Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: January 13, 2023Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of motion
Date: January 13, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: January 17, 2023Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of motion
Date: April 19, 2023Complaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kiara C Gitlin (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.