Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lopez, Maria M.B., Santiago, Hermenegildo B., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Probate Conservator Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial) Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Investigator's Instructions | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigation Report Fee waived |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation for Conservatorship | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 1/19/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 (cc emailed) |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Conservator Screening Form | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplemental Information | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Capacity Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.