Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bailey, Skyler Ashley, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigation Report Fee waived |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 1/27/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 (cc in box 11) |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: Petitioner (Skyler A. Bailey) Nomination: Jason Bailey (Father), and Tiffany Chavez (Mother) Waiver of notice of hearing: Jason Bailey (Father), Tiffany Chavez (Mother), and Melvin Bailey (Paternal Grandfather) |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardian Screening Form | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Dec. Under Uniform Child Custody & Jurisdict & Enforce Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.