Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hensley, Karen M., Turner, Steven B., filed a(n) Succession of Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryPetition To Determine Succession |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeSuccession of Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Determine Succession Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Calendar Setting | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 2/2/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Dept. 303 |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.