Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salazar, Maria A., filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategorySpousal Property Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Spousal Property Petition (Initial)
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order (cc emailed) Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 1/28/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition (Initial) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.