Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thiessen, Donald, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing the First or Final Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Filing the First or Final Account. Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Distribution Report of Administrator and Petition for Its Approval, for Allowance of Statutory Legal Fees, Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, and For Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Calendar Setting and Important Instructions For Probate Zoom Hearings | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address (Generic) Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Accounting and Agreement For Distribution of Real Property and Tangible Personal Property | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing--Decedent's Estate or Trust 11/16/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Final Distribution Report of Administrator and Petition for Its Approval, for Allowance of Statutory Legal Fees, Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, and For Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.