Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hernandez, Rafaela, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing RE: Consideration of Medical Consent Powers Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing RE: Consideration of Medical Consent Powers Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Status RE: Consideration of Medical Consent Powers Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Status RE: Consideration of Medical Consent Powers Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Consideration of Medical Consent Powers Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.