Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Fresno, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against O'Rourke Bravo, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Noelle E. Pebet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryDafs |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Joinder
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Child Support
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Commissioner Pebet minute order. See attached | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Health Care
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to: Governmental Notice of Motion or Order to Show Cause FL-685 |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Defective | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Party served: Monica O Rourke Bravo and Benjamin Bravo Hernandez Hernandez. Date mailed: 09/16/2020. |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Entry of Judgment; Child Support; Health Care; Join Other Parent. Hrg: 11/03/2020 1:15 p.m. Dept. 301 |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Filed Family Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.