Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Tire Distributors Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gaba, Rodolfo, Jr, against Agri Center Auto Parts, Inc., Sorenson, Phillip James, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Request for Court Judgment
Date: November 04, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 24, 2020Judgment Received
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Order Denied
Date: September 17, 2020Judgment Received
Date: September 15, 2020Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: September 15, 2020Request for Court Judgment
Date: September 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest Declaration Filed |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Forward to: Dept 404 on 11/6/2020 Judgment |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by mail as to Request for Entry of Default. | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Lieu of Testimony CCP585 Declaration Filed |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba, Jr. re: Lost Original Contract; Order Received for Signature Forward to: Dept 404 on 11/6/2020 Order for: Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba, Jr. re: Lost Original Contract; [Proposed] Order Thereon |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. Pursuant to CCP1033 Declaration Filed |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Order Denying Application for Default Judgment Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.