Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Andrade, Jonathan, Andrade, Monica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hundal, Kamalpreet, Hundal, Kirandeep, Hundal, Simran, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: July 09, 2021Statement filed
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 04, 2021Statement filed
Date: November 23, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: December 28, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 16, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 31, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 28, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 21, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: December 28, 2020Order Denied
Date: January 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 27, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: January 26, 2022Order Denied
Date: July 21, 2021Opposition filed
Date: February 16, 2022ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: March 01, 2022Order Denied
Date: November 18, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 17, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 18, 2021Opposition filed
Date: April 01, 2022Opposition filed
Date: April 01, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2021Order Denied
Date: December 02, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 03, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 02, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 01, 2021Opposition filed
Date: February 16, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: March 02, 2022Opposition filed
Date: April 01, 2022Reply filed
Date: February 23, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 01, 2022Letter Received
Date: April 07, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: June 16, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: June 03, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: March 02, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: April 14, 2022Association of Attorney filed
Date: May 25, 2022Reply filed
Date: June 09, 2022Opposition filed
Date: June 03, 2022Reply filed
Date: April 07, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Reply filed
Date: February 18, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Statement filed
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 28, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 28, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 22, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: July 07, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 30, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: November 23, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 29, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: July 21, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: July 21, 2021Statement filed
Date: November 23, 2021Order Denied
Date: July 01, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: August 19, 2022Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 19, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 19, 2022Order Granted
Date: August 22, 2022Statement filed
Date: August 19, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: January 26, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 28, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 19, 2022Statement filed
Date: August 19, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: August 22, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 02, 2022Amendment filed
Date: September 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 26, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 29, 2022Proof of Service
Date: October 05, 2022Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: October 06, 2022Order Granted
Date: October 07, 2022Answer Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: October 07, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 21, 2022Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified
Date: October 26, 2022ADR Report - Case Not Resolved filed
Date: November 04, 2022Fax Received
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 07, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Ex parte Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 28, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: January 18, 2023Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: January 24, 2023Order filed
Date: January 30, 2023Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: December 16, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: December 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 01, 2023Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self
Date: March 17, 2023Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Jonathan Andrade v. Simran Hundal / Lead Case Superior Court Case No. 20CECG03720 Hearing Date: February 1, 2024 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Plaintiffs’ for Summary Adjudication of Defendants’ First, T... | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 6-9 days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self Judge Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self Judge Jon M. Skiles |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment w/ Order After PTDC & CM |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Atty Rene Ucros for Plaintiffs; Atty Kyle Cantu for Defendant |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Discovery Conference
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.