Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cruz Mendez, Rufino Celso, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 17, 2020 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Order Received for Signature
Date: August 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 29, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 12, 2020Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received
Date: November 12, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 12, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 12, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 26, 2021Order filed
Date: January 26, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 21, 2020Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor
Date: August 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment With certificate of mailing |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order filed deposit money into blocked account Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Striking/Voiding Filed Documents Stricken Order Guardian Ad Litem signed on 11-13-2020. |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed Amended Order Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
4209425_885amendedGA Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received Signed order forwarded to clerks office 1/26/2021 Forwarded to: Dept 501 **AMENDED |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed ***STRICKEN PER MINUTE ORDER 1-26-2021*** Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to: 501 (RA) Amended Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received Signed order forwarded to clerks office 11/13/2020 Forwarded to: 501 ***AMENDED |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to: 501 (RA) Amended Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.