Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sunpower Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Friedman, Joshua P, against Garcia, Lucinda E, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2020 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Received for Signature
Date: September 14, 2020Application for Publication/Posting Order filed
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Other Publication |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from chambers |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.