Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvino, Jennifer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Defelice, Dennis, Welsh, Colin S., Miser, John, against California Department Of Motor Vehicles, Haning, Douglas Winfield, Hudson Insurance Company, Winfield Haning, Douglas, represented by Defelice, Dennis, Pro Se, Ramey, Wiley, Tomlin, Timothy J., Richardson, J. Brent, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2020 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges several violations and causes of action against the defendants, Douglas Winefield Haning dba Gold Rush Auto Wholesale and Hudson Insurance Company. The plaintiff, Jennifer Alvino, purchased a 2011 Jeep Liberty from Gold Rush an...
Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 18, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 14, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Objection filed
Date: December 16, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 22, 2021ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: July 28, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: November 30, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: July 09, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 08, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 07, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Opposition filed
Date: December 04, 2020Answer Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: November 16, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 13, 2020ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
6-8-22 (Proposed) Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Order Received for Signature (Proposed) Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
6-7-2022 Minute Order Attachment and certificate of mailing Minute Order Attachment and certificate of mailing |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall DATY: Nanette Beaumont |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person DATY: Robert Ashley |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney Filed 4/7/22 ~ Robert Ashley Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.