Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Conway, Brian, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Barsotti, Todd B., Pro Se, against Blum, Patricia, Crestwood Behavioral Health, Inc., Dobbins, Derek, Norris, Pamela, represented by Lucia, Kimberly A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 28, 2020Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 09, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 29, 2021Opposition filed
Date: January 15, 2021Statement filed
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 28, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 01, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: July 02, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: July 02, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 17, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: September 28, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 28, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 25, 2020Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 30, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: January 29, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Statement filed
Date: July 27, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 11, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 29, 2022Statement filed
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 28, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 23, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 20, 2023Statement filed
Date: March 14, 2023Request for Judical Notice
Date: September 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
03/20/23 -Minute Order Attachment w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - From Chambers re: Arbitration Minute Order Attachment w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - From Chambers re: Arbitration Status Conference |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
3-14-23 Joint Arbitration Status Statement Statement filed Joint Arbitration Status Statement |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/23/2023 Minute Order Attachment w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order Attachment w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - From Chambers re: Arbitration Status Conference set for 02/09/2023 continued |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert Notice Filed Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
10.28.22 Minute Order from Chambers and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order Attachment from Chambers and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.