Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Fresno, People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case represented by Papazian, Sarah A, against Spirit Of Woman Of California Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management107 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Received for Signature
Date: June 09, 2020Petition filed
Date: June 08, 2020Opposition filed
Date: June 10, 2020Request Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Order filed
Date: June 12, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 09, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 10, 2020Order Granted
Date: June 18, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 12, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 15, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 24, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Response filed
Date: June 10, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 11, 2020Order filed
Date: July 07, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 01, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 09, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 10, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 15, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 23, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 01, 2020Order filed
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 13, 2021Statement filed
Date: July 20, 2020Petition filed
Date: June 08, 2020Application Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Request Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Petition filed
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) & CM |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
5-25-22 Order Approving Final Report of Receiver and Related Relief and Discharge of Receiver Order Granted Order Approving Final Report of Receiver and Related Relief and Discharge of Receiver Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting Filed 3/7/22 ~ David Stapleton Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Final Approval Class Settlement David Stapleton Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
May 25, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: City of Fresno v. Spirit of Woman, Inc. Superior Court Case No. 20CECG01636 Hearing Date: May 25, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: Final Accounting of Receiver Tentative Ruling: To grant and sign the orde... | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/7/22 Proof of Service - Fresno 3.7.22 Proof of Service |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/7/22 Motion Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Settling and Approving Receivers Final Report and Accounting |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/7/22 Decl of DS iso Final Motion - Fresno 3.7.22 Declaration Filed of David Stapleton ISO Motion for Order Settling and Approving Receivers Final Report and Accounting |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/7/22 Proposed Order - Fresno 3.7.22 Order Received for Signature **order signed 5/24/22 and fwd to clerks office** [Proposed] Order Approving FInal Report of Receiver and Related Relief and Discharge of Receiver |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & CM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.