Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Casida, Veronica, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jones, Andrew B., against California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitation, California Prison Industries Authority, California Prison Industry Authority, represented by Halloran, Peter D., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management189 days |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2020 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
Time To Trial858 days |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Summons issued and filed
Date: March 05, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 05, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 27, 2021ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: January 14, 2021Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 13, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 27, 2021Reply filed
Date: June 24, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 26, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 19, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 19, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 18, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 04, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 04, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: May 04, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 19, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 05, 2020Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: March 05, 2020ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: January 04, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 28, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 10, 2020ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: January 08, 2021Amended Document Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 08, 2022Judgment Received
Date: July 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Dismissal Not Entered
Date: March 03, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Amended Document Filed
Date: July 19, 2021Reply filed
Date: June 17, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: June 30, 2021Amended Document Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Request Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Estimated 5-8 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/8/22 - Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review of California Prison Industry Authority |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
3-3-22 Request for Dismissal (denied) Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Entire action cannot be dismissed as judgment entered on 7/16/2021 in favor of a Defendant |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee Answer Filed Answer to Third Amended Complaint |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed Third Amended Complaint filed. |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (as to CDCR) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee) Amended Document Filed Second Amended Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.