Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Melgar Jose, Melgar Teresa, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Lynch Robert James, against Markarian Setrag, Markas Construction An Unknown Business Entity, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with John J. Kralik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Kralik Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: February 28, 2020in Department B
Date: February 28, 2020Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: January 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 23, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 13, 2020Order - ORDER ON PETITION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY FROM MECHANIC LIEN
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: February 28, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY-MECHANIC'S LIEN FILED...)
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Petition for Release of Property From Mechanic's Lien)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Release Property-Mechanic's Lien filed...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order (on Petition for Release of Property from Mechanic Lien)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.