Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whitaker Brian, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Ballister Raymond G., against Esa P Portfolio Operating Lessee Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Abraham Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeirdre H. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: CCP 170.6 Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 11, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 11, 2020Complaint
Date: September 11, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 17, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: October 15, 2020Answer
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 22, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 22, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING DISMISSAL
Date: December 30, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2021Complaint
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 10/19/2020)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: CCP 170.6 Challenge))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.