Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Del Amo Fashion Center Operating Company L.L.C., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Herzog Jonathon, against Mtrg Llc, Sasspal Gaurav Sonny, Sasspal Geeta Chhabria, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ramona G. See presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamona G. See Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 18, 2020Complaint
Date: February 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MTRG LLC)
Date: February 20, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: March 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 06, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION
Date: March 10, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 06, 2020Complaint
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MTRG LLC))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Geeta Chhabria Sasspal))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Gaurav Sonny Sasspal))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Entire Action)
Date: March 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default
Date: March 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.