Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ghai Manmeet filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against La City Parking Van Nuys, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 08, 2021Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 28, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: September 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/20/2020
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: November 20, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Manmeet Ghai (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.