Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2020Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 15, 2021Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Leslie Zock (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: September 14, 2020Notice of Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal
Date: September 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal
Date: September 30, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: October 05, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Leslie Zock (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.