Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Benouni Behrouz filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Behrouz Benouni (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: July 15, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Behrouz Benouni (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.